WY SF0031 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to minerals; providing for the issuance of proposals for a mineral to liquid fuel commercial facility feasibility study as specified; requiring a report; providing for a matching fund program; providing legislative findings; providing an appropriation; providing for the submission of an application for abandoned mine land funds as specified; providing a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Advanced conversion technologies study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S09; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff; Intro Vote | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/SF0031.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Introduced/SF0031.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/SF0031.htm |