WY SF0030 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property taxes; revising the penalty for failing to report business property to the county assessor; requiring the department of audit to collect information during audits as specified; providing fees for nonreported and omitted business property; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Reporting of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to {NextAssignedTo} 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to {NextAssignedTo} 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-02 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2020-02-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-13 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 27-2-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |