WY SF0030 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to domestic and sexual violence; creating a Wyoming Safe Homes Act as specified; authorizing a victim of domestic or sexual violence to terminate a lease as specified; providing an affirmative defense as specified; requiring a landlord and authorizing a tenant to change door locks if specified conditions are met; amending existing provisions as specified; providing penalties; providing definitions; prohibiting waiver of provisions of act by separate agreement; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Safe Homes Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Barbuto [D] | Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Sen. Stan Cooper [R] | Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] |
Rep. Kathy Davison [R] | Sen. John Hastert [D] | Rep. Bryan Pedersen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2011-01-17 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-15 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/SF0030.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/SF0030.pdf |