WY SF0027 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to environmental quality; authorizing modification or suspension of certain requirements for limited mining operations as specified; providing a per acre maximum dollar amount for a reclamation performance bond for limited surface mining operations which do not require a permit under the Environmental Quality Act; amending bonding requirements for small mining operations requiring a permit under the Environmental Quality Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Limited mining operations.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-15 | Governor Signed SEA0019 | |
2013-02-12 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2013-02-11 | Assigned Number SEA0019 | |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Did Concur |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-07 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-07 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-04 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2013-01-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-17 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-16 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-16 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-13 | Bill Number Assigned |