WY SF0027 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0029
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0029
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; providing a process for lodging concerns with and for review of competition by government entities with the private sector; requiring a report to the legislature; providing a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Government competition.
Sponsors
Sen. Cale Case [R] | Rep. David Miller [R] | Rep. Sue Wallis [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0029 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0029 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0029 | |
2010-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0029 | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-24 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-24 | (H09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H09 | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-19 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-16 | (S07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S07 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |