WY SF0025 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to liens; reorganizing lien statutes as specified; generally amending and clarifying the process for filing liens; specifying time limits for filing forms; amending substantive rights under lien provisions; conforming statutes; authorizing attorney fees and costs as specified; amending definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-05 - Senate - S Adopted SF0025JC01 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-26 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S01 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-09 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-09 Governor Signed SEA No. 0053
2010-03-05 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0053
2010-03-05 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0053
2010-03-05 Assigned Number SEA No. 0053
2010-03-05 (H) Adopted SF0025JC01
2010-03-05 (S) Adopted SF0025JC01
2010-03-04 (H) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-04 (S) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-04 (S) Did Not Concur
2010-03-04 (S) Received for Concurrence
2010-03-03 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-02 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-03-01 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-26 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-26 (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-24 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2010-02-24 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-02-17 (S01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-08 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2010-02-08 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback