WY SF0023 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to controlled substances; providing penalties for possession of marihuana and tetrahydrocannabinols in nonplant form; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Possession of nonplant form marihuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-17 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-17 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2018-03-07 | House | COW |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-05 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-16 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 24-6-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-19 | Bill Number Assigned |