WY SF0022 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to courts; requiring acceptance of electronic filings in courts without an electronic filing system; specifying applicability; specifying procedures; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic court filings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateCOW:S Did not consider for COW
2021-01-27SenatePlaced on General File
2021-01-27SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2021-01-12SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-12-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback