WY SF0022 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cities and towns; specifying the authority of cities and towns over surface water diversion; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Surface water diversion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 58 | |
2020-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0031 | |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0031 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0031 |
2020-03-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0031 | |
2020-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-02 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2020-02-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-13 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-12-17 | Bill Number Assigned |