WY SF0022 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school districts; removing the requirement that school district personnel be under contract with the school district to qualify to carry a firearm on school property; removing volunteers from the definition of employee in W.S. 21-3-132(b); and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School district personnel definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Assigned Chapter Number 32
2019-02-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0013
2019-02-13HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0013
2019-02-12SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0013
2019-02-12 Assigned Number SEA No. 0013
2019-02-12House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2019-02-11House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-08HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-07HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-07HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-11SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-11SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-11SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback