WY SF0022 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 97 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure and orders of protection; amending the crime of felony stalking; modifying provisions relating to orders of protection as specified; making conforming amendments; repealing provisions relating to orders of protection; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Orders of protection-revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16 Chapter No. 97 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
2018-03-16 Governor Signed SEA No. 0049
2018-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number 97
2018-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0049
2018-03-09SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0049
2018-03-09 Assigned Number SEA No. 0049
2018-03-09SenateConcur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2018-03-08SenateReceived for Concurrence
2018-03-08House3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0
2018-03-07House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-06HouseCOW:Passed
2018-03-05HousePlaced on General File
2018-03-05HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2018-03-01HouseH01 :Rerefer to Appropriations
2018-03-01HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2018-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2018-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-16SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0
2018-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-12-19 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback