WY SF0022 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to oil and gas taxation; authorizing the department to suspend processing of amended production tax returns below a specified amount as provided; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notice of valuation change reporting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28 S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2017-02-03SenateNo report prior to COW Cutoff
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2017-01-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-12-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback