WY SF0022 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to insurance; providing the insurance policy with specified modifications thereto is the insurance contract between the insurer and the insured; providing other statements including advertising and certificates of insurance do not modify the insurance contract; providing for disclosures in certificates of insurance; providing for clarification of contract provisions; providing penalties for false statements concerning insurance coverage as specified; providing for civil actions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - Senate - S07 Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4 (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-05SenateMotion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4
2014-02-21SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2014-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07
2014-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-12-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback