WY SF0022 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0037
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to trade and commerce; amending provisions of the Wyoming Uniform Consumer Credit Code as specified; creating definitions; amending definitions; increasing the jurisdictional amount of a transaction under the Uniform Consumer Credit Code as specified; providing authority to the banking commissioner to enforce violations of United States department of defense regulations pertaining to consumer loans to military personnel as specified; repealing provisions relating to regulations adopted by the board of governors of the federal reserve system; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Consumer Credit Code amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-19 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0037
2013-02-20SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0037
2013-02-19 Assigned Number SEA0037
2013-02-19HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-14HousePassed CoW
2013-02-06HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-06HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09
2013-01-18HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-16SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-15SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-15 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-15SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-01-14SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-14SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09
2013-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2012-12-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback