WY SF0020 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-12 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; prohibiting an officer or employee of a school district from requiring access to a digital information account of a student or prospective student; prohibiting waiver of rights; providing exceptions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student digital information privacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-12 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-12 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-11 - Senate - COW:Passed 13-12-5-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - COW:Passed 13-12-5-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-12Senatepostponed indefinitely
2017-01-12Senate2nd Reading:Failed 12-18-0-0-0
2017-01-11SenatePlaced on General File
2017-01-11SenateCOW:Passed 13-12-5-0-0
2017-01-11SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2017-01-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-12-05 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback