WY SF0020 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state lands; requiring state agencies to obtain the advice and consent of the board of land commissioners before the receipt, acquisition, exchange, sale or disposal of land; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State land transactions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-12 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-22HousePlaced on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
2013-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-12HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05
2013-01-18HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-16SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-16 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-16SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-01-15SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-15 Amendment Failed
2013-01-15SenateLaid Back Pursuant to SR 7-3
2013-01-11SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-11SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05
2013-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2012-12-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback