WY SF0020 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to livestock; imposing liability for the failure to give notice of diseased livestock as specified; assigning burdens of proof; providing exceptions to liability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Livestock disease reporting and liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-07 (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
2012-02-14 (S) Introduced and Referred to S05; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff; Intro Vote
2012-02-13 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback