WY SF0020 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; prohibiting the use of handheld electronic wireless communication devices for sending text or electronic mail messages while operating a motor vehicle; providing exceptions; providing definitions; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Text-based communications prohibited while driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-04 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - "(e) No motor vehicle shall be halted solely for a violation of this section.". PERKINS, MEIER (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-10 Governor Signed SEA No. 0045
2010-03-05 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0045
2010-03-04 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0045
2010-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0045
2010-03-03 (H) Reconsidered Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-03 (H) Reconsidered
2010-02-24 (H08) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-17 (H) Introduced and Referred to H08
2010-02-16 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-02-15 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-12 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-11 (S) Laid Back Pursuant to SR 10-4(a)
2010-02-10 (S) Passed CoW
2010-02-09 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-09 (S08) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-08 (S) Introduced and Referred to S08
2010-02-08 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-01-05 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback