WY SF0019 | 2024 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Assigned Chapter Number 95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to developmental preschool funding; modifying the per child amounts used to calculate payments to service providers; modifying requirements for the department of health's budget request for developmental preschool services as specified; modifying the date utilized to count the number of children that participate in the program; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Developmental preschool funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-07 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-12-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-3-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-20 Assigned Chapter Number 95
2024-03-20 Governor Signed SEA No. 0056
2024-03-08HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0056
2024-03-08SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0056
2024-03-07 Assigned Number SEA No. 0056
2024-03-07SenateConcur:Passed 30-0-1-0-0
2024-03-07SenateReceived for Concurrence
2024-03-06House3rd Reading:Passed 50-12-0-0-0
2024-03-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2024-03-04HouseCOW:Passed
2024-03-04HousePlaced on General File
2024-03-04HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2024-03-04House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2024-03-04HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2024-02-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2024-02-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2024-02-27Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-3-0-0-0
2024-02-26Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2024-02-23SenateCOW:Passed
2024-02-20SenatePlaced on General File
2024-02-20SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2024-02-19Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2024-02-19SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2024-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education 29-2-0-0-0
2024-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2023-12-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/SF0019
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2024/Introduced/SF0019.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2024/Engross/SF0019.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2024/Enroll/SF0019.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2024/Amends/SF0019SS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2024/Amends/SF0019SS002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2024/Amends/SF0019HS001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2024/Fiscal/SF0019.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2024/Summaries/SF0019.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/SF0019#138
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/SF0019#-71
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/SF0019#-193
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/SF0019#454
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/SF0019#-421
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/SF0019#-454
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/SF0019#5435
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2024/SF0019#615

Bill Comments

feedback