WY SF0019 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; specifying the assumption of risk for exposure to or contracting COVID-19; defining terms related to the assumption of risk for COVID-19; amending provisions related to immunity from civil liability for actions and omissions during the public health emergency declared for COVID-19; amending time period for which the worker's compensation program covers COVID-19 infections; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public health emergencies-immunity amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-22-0-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-22-0-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Assigned Chapter Number 118 | |
2021-04-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0057 | |
2021-04-02 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0057 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0057 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0057 | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Concur:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-22-0-0-0 |
2021-03-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-25 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |