WY SF0019 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0039
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0039
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; amending penalties for crimes related to domestic assault and battery, strangulation and stalking; amending enhanced penalty provisions; amending the definition of violent felony; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Uniformity in domestic violence law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 34-26-0-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 34-26-0-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0039 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0039 |
2018-03-08 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0039 | |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-07 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 34-26-0-0-0 |
2018-03-06 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-05 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-16 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-14 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-19 | Bill Number Assigned |