WY SF0018 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to limited liability companies; generally updating and modifying statutes to comply with the revised uniform limited liability company act in part and with exceptions and changes; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limited liability companies-revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-04 - Senate - S Adopted SF0018JC01 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 4 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-23 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-09 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-09 Governor Signed SEA No. 0051
2010-03-05 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0051
2010-03-05 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0051
2010-03-05 Assigned Number SEA No. 0051
2010-03-05 (H) Adopted SF0018JC01
2010-03-04 (S) Adopted SF0018JC01
2010-03-03 (H) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-03 (S) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-03 (S) Did Not Concur
2010-03-03 (S) Received for Concurrence
2010-03-02 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-01 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-26 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-23 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-23 (H07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-18 (H) Introduced and Referred to H07
2010-02-18 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-02-12 (S07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-08 (S) Introduced and Referred to S07
2010-02-08 (S) Received for Introduction
2009-12-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback