WY SF0017 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - 3rd Reading:Failed 9-20-0-0-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - 3rd Reading:Failed 9-20-0-0-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental publication requirements; amending publication and online posting requirements for governmental entities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Governmental publication requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 9-20-0-0-1 (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 9-20-0-0-1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-02-04 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |