WY SF0017 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 72 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 72 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public works and contracts; amending the preference for Wyoming materials as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Resident contractor materials preference.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Chapter No. 72 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-03 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0032 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0032 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0032 |
2015-02-26 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0032 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-25 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 |
2015-02-24 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-20 | Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2015-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-19 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-22 | Bill Number Assigned |