WY SF0014 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; amending provisions governing reinsurance; providing requirements and procedures for an assuming insurer of reinsurance as specified; providing requirements for the insurance commissioner; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Credit for reinsurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-1-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-1-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 25 | |
2021-02-09 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0007 | |
2021-02-05 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0007 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0007 |
2021-02-04 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0007 | |
2021-02-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 |
2021-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-02-02 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2021-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-0-1-0 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |