WY SF0014 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; prohibiting school districts from accessing students' digital information accounts as specified; providing for criminal penalties; amending requirements of state data security plan to ensure privacy of student data collected; requiring policies for the collection, access, security and use of student data by school districts; accordingly imposing duties; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student data privacy and transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call 16- (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion passed by roll call 16- (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-04Senatepostponed indefinitely
2016-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 36-22-2-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2016-02-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2016-02-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-15Senate3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0
2016-02-12Senate3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
2016-02-11Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-10SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-10SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-10 S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education 27-3-0-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-12-31 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback