WY SF0012 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-26 - COW:Failed 6-51-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-26 - COW:Failed 6-51-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to veterans; establishing the Vietnam War commemoration account; establishing the Vietnam War commemoration matching account; authorizing the veterans' commission to contract for services as specified; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vietnam War commemoration-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - House - COW:Failed 6-51-3-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | House | COW:Failed 6-51-3-0-0 |
2016-02-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-25 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 6-1-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-24 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-24 | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2016-02-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-17 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-16 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-16 | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 21-9-0-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |