WY SF0011 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the department of health and veterans; creating a new skilled nursing center for veterans and others; establishing a fund; providing an appropriation; requiring repayment of the appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Veterans skilled nursing center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2012-02-22 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-20 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-14 | (S08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/SF0011.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Introduced/SF0011.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/SF0011.htm |