WY SF0009 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to government ethics; amending definitions and procedures for the Ethics and Disclosure Act; expanding the scope of the Act to local governmental entities and additional state employees; amending penalties for violations of the Act; amending conduct that constitutes a misuse of public resources; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ethics and Disclosure Act amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2020-02-25 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-14 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-12-10 | Bill Number Assigned |