WY SF0009 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 61 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to railroad quiet zones; providing for administration of the railroad quiet zone program as specified; specifying grant matching requirements; reappropriating funds; repealing existing law regarding railroad quiet zones; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroad quiet zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 61 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0032
2016-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0032
2016-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0032
2016-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0032
2016-03-01SenateConcur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-03-01SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-01House3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0
2016-02-29House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-26HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
2016-02-24HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-24 H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2016-02-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2016-02-19HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-18Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-17Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-16SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-15 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-11SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-11 S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 25-5-0-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-12-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback