WY SF0009 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 175 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Right to Farm and Ranch Act; guaranteeing the right to farm and ranch as specified; providing exceptions; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right to farm.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-22-1-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-22-1-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 175 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0077
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0077
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0077
2015-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0077
2015-03-04SenateConcur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
2015-03-04SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-04House3rd Reading:Passed 37-22-1-0-0
2015-03-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-03-02HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-24 Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2015-01-27HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-23Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2015-01-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-21SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-19SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-19 Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2015-01-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-12-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback