WY SF0008 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 179 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education accountability; conforming law as specified to Powers v. State, 2014 WY 15, 318 P.3d 300 and Powers v. State, No. 180-673 (1st Jud. Dist. Ct. Apr. 18, 2014); modifying administration of the statewide job skills assessment test and the college entrance exam; delaying implementation and modifying development of phase II for teacher and school leader accountability; providing for phase I school accountability implementation and refinement; prescribing oversight and use of district assessment systems in state accountability; modifying the process for incorporation of revised state standards into assessments; modifying state criteria for high school graduation; providing for continuation of select accountability and advisory committees; establishing a technical advisory group to study alternative school accountability; establishing a taskforce to study statewide assessment; eliminating item type restrictions on the statewide student assessment for grades nine (9) and ten (10) for one (1) year; requiring reporting requirements; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State education accountability and assessment.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - House - Adopted SF0008JC001: 40-13-7-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted SF0008JC001: 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted SF0008JC001: 40-13-7-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted SF0008JC001: 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted SF0008JC001: 40-13-7-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted SF0008JC001: 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0 (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 179 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0087
2015-03-06HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0087
2015-03-06SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0087
2015-03-06 Assigned Number SEA No. 0087
2015-03-05HouseAdopted SF0008JC001: 40-13-7-0-0
2015-03-05SenateAdopted SF0008JC001: 26-3-1-0-0
2015-03-05HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-05HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-04SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-04SenateConcur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0
2015-03-04SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-04House3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0
2015-03-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-03-02HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-27HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-27 Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2015-02-26HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-26 Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0
2015-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2015-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-26Senate3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0
2015-01-23Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2015-01-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-21SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-20SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-20 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-19SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2015-01-19SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-19 Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2015-01-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-12-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback