WY SF0007 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; limiting state reimbursements for buildings leased by a school district or charter school; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School buildings and facilities-lease reimbursements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-7-2-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 70 | |
2020-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0025 | |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0025 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0025 |
2020-03-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0025 | |
2020-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-7-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-03 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2020-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-14 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-14 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-12-10 | Bill Number Assigned |