WY SF0007 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Chapter No. 5 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Chapter No. 5 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to municipal solid waste facilities remediation projects; authorizing expenditure of previously appropriated funds; establishing a prioritized list of projects; authorizing the department of environmental quality limited discretionary authority to modify the prioritized list; providing a definition; repealing a prior list of priority remediation projects; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Landfill remediation priority list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Chapter No. 5 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-02 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-02-29 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0003 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0003 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0003 |
2016-02-24 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0003 | |
2016-02-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-17 | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2016-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-12 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-10 | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-12-17 | Bill Number Assigned |