WY SF0006 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 70 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the judiciary; authorizing an additional district judge in the first judicial district; specifying conditions for the authorization to be effective; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

First judicial district-number of district judges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 70 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0043
2016-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0043
2016-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0043
2016-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0043
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2016-02-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-17SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-17 S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 27-3-0-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-12-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback