WY SF0005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the budget reserve account; repealing the budget reserve account; amending loan authority, distributions, reversions and transfers of funds authorized to or from the budget reserve account; providing for a general fund reserve amount and authorizing the transfer of excess general funds as specified; making conforming amendments; repealing obsolete language; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget reserve account-repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-01-16SenateS02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-12-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback