WY SF0005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 23 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 23 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to banks, banking and finance; authorizing various fees to be established by rule and regulation; increasing the number of deputy commissioners the state banking commissioner may employ; increasing minimum capital stock requirements for organization of banks; modifying requirements concerning bank director oaths and sworn financial statements; increasing the minimum value at which certain bank acquired property must be appraised by a certified or licensed real estate appraiser; modifying indebtedness restrictions; modifying requirements related to amendments to articles of incorporation; modifying and clarifying requirements related to formation of trust companies; permitting an out-of-state trust company to operate a trust service office in this state as specified; modifying provisions related to limited liability companies; repealing provisions related to remote electronic terminals; amending requirements related to branch bank licenses; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Banking revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-24-0-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-24-0-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-24-0-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-24-0-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Chapter No. 23 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-21 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0007 | |
2017-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0007 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0007 |
2017-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0007 | |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-13 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 36-24-0-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-06 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2017-01-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-16 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-12 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-11-29 | Bill Number Assigned |