WY SF0005 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to teachers; clarifying eligibility for the national board certification pay incentive reimbursement program; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers-national certification pay incentive.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-03 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed SEA0033
2014-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0033
2014-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0033
2014-03-03 Assigned Number SEA0033
2014-03-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-28HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-27HousePassed CoW
2014-02-27HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-27HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-20HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04
2014-02-19HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-02-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-17SenatePassed CoW
2014-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-14SenateRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04
2014-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-11-21 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback