WY SF0004 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; providing timeline for possession of ballots for military and overseas voters; providing for electronic transmission of ballots to military and overseas voters; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Elections-military and overseas voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-11 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-17 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0009 | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0009 | |
2011-02-11 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0009 | |
2011-02-11 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0009 | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-07 | (H07) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H07 | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-18 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-14 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-13 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-13 | (S07) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S07 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-11-18 | Bill Number Assigned |