WY SF0003 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 107 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to veterans; providing for permissive private employer hiring preference for veterans and spouses of disabled and deceased veterans; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permissive preference for veterans in private employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - House - Adopted SF0003JC002: 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0003JC002: 20-7-3-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Concur:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 107 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0063
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0063
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0063
2016-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0063
2016-03-04HouseAdopted SF0003JC002: 58-0-2-0-0
2016-03-04SenateAdopted SF0003JC002: 20-7-3-0-0
2016-03-04 Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2016-03-03 Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2016-03-03 JCC Requested a New Committee to be Appointed
2016-03-03HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-02-29SenateConcur:Failed 15-14-1-0-0
2016-02-29SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-29House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2016-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-24 H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2016-02-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-16Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
2016-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-12SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-12 S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 23-7-0-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-12-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback