WY SF0002 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to appropriations for the legislature; providing appropriations for the operation of the legislative branch of state government; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Legislative budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Amendment failed 16-34-1-0-9 (Y: 16 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment failed 10-20-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Amendment adopted 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Amendment failed 16-34-1-0-9 (Y: 16 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Amendment failed 10-20-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Amendment adopted 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number 5 | |
2022-03-07 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0003 | |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0003 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0003 |
2022-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0003 | |
2022-03-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 |
2022-03-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-25 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2022-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-02-15 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |