WY SF0001 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - See Mirror Bill HB0001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - See Mirror Bill HB0001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to make appropriations for the fiscal biennium commencing July 1, 2018 and ending June 30, 2020; providing definitions; providing for appropriations and transfers of funds for the period of the budget and for the remainder of the current biennium as specified; providing for carryover of certain funds beyond the biennium as specified; providing for employee positions as specified; providing for duties, terms and conditions and other requirements relating to appropriations for the remainder of the current biennium and the period of the budget as specified; providing for position and other budgetary limitations; amending existing law by redirecting revenues and making transfers for the remainder of the current biennium and the period of the budget; imposing a surcharge; reducing prior appropriations; creating a select committee; providing for reports related to appropriations; and providing for effective dates.
Title
General government appropriations-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | See Mirror Bill HB0001 |
2018-03-12 | House | Adopt JCC #1 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Adopt JCC #1 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2018-03-01 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2018-02-28 | House:Pursuant to JR 14-1 (g) referred directly to JCC | |
2018-02-28 | House:Pursuant to JR 14-1 (f) referred directly to 3rd Reading | |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 |
2018-02-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-19 | Senate | COW:Considered |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to SCOW |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-16 | Bill Number Assigned |