WY HJ0013 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0004
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0004
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION in support of Taiwan.
Title
Support of Taiwan.
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Governor Signed HEJR No. 0004 | |
2021-04-06 | Senate | President Signed HEJR No. 0004 |
2021-04-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0004 |
2021-04-02 | Assigned Number HEJR No. 0004 | |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-31 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-18 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Bill Number Assigned |