WY HJ0011 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to modify, in health care provider cases, the general prohibition against the legislature limiting the amount of damages that may be recovered for causing personal injury or death of any person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Noneconomic damages-constitutional amendment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - House - H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5- (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-04 H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-
2015-02-09HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2015-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2015-01-30HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback