WY HJ0010 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION to designate cities and communities in the state of Wyoming as Medal of Honor cities or communities to honor the Medal of Honor recipients connected with the cities or communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medal of Honor cities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Governor Signed HEJR No. 0003
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEJR No. 0003
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEJR No. 0003
2019-02-26 Assigned Number HEJR No. 0003
2019-02-26HouseConcur:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
2019-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-21SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback