WY HJ0009 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to modify the mandatory retirement age for supreme court justices and judges of other courts in Wyoming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory judicial retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-07 - Senate - S Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H01 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-07 (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
2012-02-23 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
2012-02-23 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-22 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-21 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-21 Amendment Failed
2012-02-20 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-20 Amendment Failed
2012-02-20 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-20 (H) Amendments Adopted
2012-02-17 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-17 (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-16 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2012-02-15 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback