WY HJ0008 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION urging Congress to propose a constitutional amendment ensuring free and fair elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Free and fair elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-20-3-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-20SenateS07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 37-20-3-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-29HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback