WY HJ0008 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION to commemorate the sesquicentennial of the signing of the 1868 Treaty of Fort Bridger.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

150th Anniversary of the 1868 Treaty of Fort Bridger.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Adopted HJ0008JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Adopted HJ0008JC001: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Concur:Failed 3-57-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16 Governor Signed HEJR No. 0003
2018-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2018-03-09SenatePresident Signed HEJR No. 0003
2018-03-09HouseSpeaker Signed HEJR No. 0003
2018-03-09 Assigned Number HEJR No. 0003
2018-03-08SenateAdopted HJ0008JC001: 30-0-0-0-0
2018-03-08HouseAdopted HJ0008JC001: 60-0-0-0-0
2018-03-06SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2018-03-06HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2018-03-06HouseConcur:Failed 3-57-0-0-0
2018-03-05HouseReceived for Concurrence
2018-03-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2018-03-02Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-01SenateCOW:Passed
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on General File
2018-03-01SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2018-02-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2018-02-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-21HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-21HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 60-0-0-0-0
2018-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback