WY HJ0008 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to uphold the federal trust responsibility to provide for the health care needs of American Indians.
Title
Federal responsibility for American Indian health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Allen [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | President Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2017-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2017-02-16 | Assigned Number HEJR No. 0001 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | Senate | S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-31 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-27 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2017-01-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-26 | Bill Number Assigned |