WY HJ0008 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to require courts in this state to rely on federal and state laws when deciding cases and to forbid courts from considering international law or Sharia law when deciding cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sharia law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-28 (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
2011-01-21 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
2011-01-20 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-19 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback